Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Financial Institutions – Mortgage Loan Originators – Independent Contractors
Sponsored by
Delegate Queen
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions of law relating to the licensing of mortgage loan originators to provide for the licensing of certain independent contractors as mortgage loan originators under certain circumstances; and requiring licensed mortgage lenders to supervise certain activities of certain mortgage loan originators in a certain manner.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0307
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2023
Legislative Date
3/18/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2023
Legislative Date
3/11/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-33)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Financial Institutions – Mortgage Loan Originators – Independent Contractors
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2023 3/18/2023 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/18/2023 3/11/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Financial Institutions – Mortgage Loan Originators – Independent Contractors
House 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Third Reading Passed (102-33) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/13/2023 Referred Finance 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/24/2023 12:57 PM
Click to return on the top page