Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Required Denials - Sociological Information and Distribution Lists
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a definition of "sociological information" adopted in rules or regulations by an official custodian for certain purposes from including a certain notice, or a list of the recipients of a certain notice; requiring a custodian to deny inspection under the Public Information Act of only a certain part of a certain distribution list, rather than the full distribution list; requiring a custodian to allow the inspection of a certain notice or a list of recipients of a certain notice under certain circumstances; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/25/2020
Legislative Date
9/25/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {996580/1 Adopted
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
26AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2021
Legislative Date
3/24/2021
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/25/2020 9/25/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Public Information Act - Required Denials - Sociological Information and Distribution Lists
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing canceled
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/11 at 4:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Favorable with Amendments {996580/1 Adopted 26AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 26AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Information Act - Required Denials - Sociological Information and Distribution Lists
House 3/19/2021 3/08/2021 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2021 3/02/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/24/2021 3/24/2021 Hearing 4/06 at 1:00 p.m.
(   4-103, 4-330, 4-341, 5-101 )
(   12-111 )
Last Updated: 4/7/2021 3:10 PM
Click to return on the top page