Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Diversion Programs
Sponsored by
Delegate Ebersole
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the establishment of law enforcement diversion programs in partnership with local behavioral health authorities; authorizing the participation of certain individuals; authorizing certain providers to provide case management including peer recovery support approaches; requiring certain planning for the implementation of certain programs; requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to submit a report on the number of law enforcement encounters resulting in a behavioral health services referral; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/24/2020
Legislative Date
9/24/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Law Enforcement Diversion Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {622519/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2021
Legislative Date
2/27/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Law Enforcement Diversion Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-0)
Proceedings
19 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/20/2021
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/24/2020 9/24/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Law Enforcement Diversion Programs
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/02/2021 3/02/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Favorable with Amendments {622519/1 Adopted 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/03/2021 2/27/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Law Enforcement Diversion Programs
House 3/04/2021 2/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (131-0) 19 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2021 2/20/2021 Referred Judicial Proceedings 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2021 3/08/2021 Hearing 3/18 at 12:30 p.m.
(   4-1001 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:27 PM
Click to return on the top page