Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Wells
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Urban Agriculture Grant Program in the Department of Agriculture to increase the viability of urban farming and improve access to urban-grown foods; establishing an Urban Agriculture Grant Fund to provide grants to nonprofit organizations in Baltimore City; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to administer the Fund; authorizing the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation for the Fund; requiring the Department to seek input from certain entities in adopting certain regulations; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0673
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1534 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/15/2020
Legislative Date
7/15/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/05/2021
Legislative Date
2/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {970612/1 Adopted
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
10AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2021
Legislative Date
2/12/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (123-8)
Proceedings
11 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2021
Legislative Date
2/11/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
12 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
4/10/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {294838/1 (Senator Gallion) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/20/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-6)
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/18/2021
Legislative Date
5/18/2021
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/15/2020 7/15/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/05/2021 2/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Favorable with Amendments {970612/1 Adopted 10AClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/11/2021 2/11/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 10AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
House 2/12/2021 2/12/2021 Third Reading Passed (123-8) 11 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/16/2021 2/11/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 12 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 4/10/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Favorable Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Floor Amendment {294838/1 (Senator Gallion) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2021 3/20/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Third Reading Passed (132-6) 47 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Post Passage 5/18/2021 5/18/2021 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Text - Chapter - Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
(   2-2001 through 2-2005 )
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:28 PM
Click to return on the top page