Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Sponsored by
Delegate Charkoudian
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a certain person that generates food residuals to separate the food residuals from other solid waste and ensure that the food residuals are diverted from final disposal in a refuse disposal system in a certain manner; applying the requirements of the Act to certain persons that generate certain amounts of food residuals; authorizing a person experiencing undue hardship because of the costs of diverting food residuals to apply for a certain waiver; requiring the Department of the Environment to issue a certain warning; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0483
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/28/2020
Legislative Date
8/28/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2021
Legislative Date
3/15/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {890612/1 Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2021
Legislative Date
3/05/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Krebs) Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {823120/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (46-90)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {953429/1 (Delegate Kipke)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Boyce) Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Floor Amendment {953429/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2021
Legislative Date
3/06/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/07/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-40)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2021
Legislative Date
2/28/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
28BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/30/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {134031/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2021
Legislative Date
3/08/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-41)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/17/2021
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/30/2021
Legislative Date
5/30/2021
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/28/2020 8/28/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2021 3/15/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Favorable with Amendments {890612/1 Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2021 3/05/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Krebs) Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {823120/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (46-90) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {953429/1 (Delegate Kipke) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Boyce) Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Floor Amendment {953429/1 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 25AClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2021 3/06/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
House 3/18/2021 3/07/2021 Third Reading Passed (97-40) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/19/2021 2/28/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 28BClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/30/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Favorable with Amendments {134031/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2021 3/08/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2021 3/09/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 House Concurs Senate Amendments 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Third Reading Passed (94-41) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2021 3/17/2021 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Post Passage 5/30/2021 5/30/2021 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439
Text - Chapter - Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 11:58 AM
Click to return on the top page