Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Unemployment Insurance – Federal Extended Benefits for Long–Term Unemployment
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Charkoudian, and Carey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 652
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the period that constitutes an extended benefit period and when a State "on" indicator exists; specifying the total amount of certain extended unemployment benefits that are payable to an eligible individual; authorizing the Secretary of Labor, if authorized by federal law, to suspend the payment of certain extended unemployment benefits; and establishing that federal unemployment law provisions and definitions related to extended benefits apply to a certain extent.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0655
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {213523/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (37-96)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-34)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-15)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 652
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Unemployment Insurance – Federal Extended Benefits for Long–Term Unemployment
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Ghrist) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Floor Amendment {213523/1 (Delegate Morgan) Rejected (37-96) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Second Reading Passed 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Unemployment Insurance – Federal Extended Benefits for Long–Term Unemployment
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (97-34) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Finance 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Second Reading Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-15) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/31/2022 3/25/2022 Returned Passed 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 652
Text - Chapter - Unemployment Insurance – Federal Extended Benefits for Long–Term Unemployment
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:12 PM
Click to return on the top page