Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Maryland Earned Income Tax Credit Assistance Program for Low-Income Families
Sponsored by
Delegates Palakovich Carr, Lierman, D. Barnes, Ebersole, Feldmark, Patterson, and Washington
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Earned Income Tax Credit Assistance Program for Low-Income Families to identify residents who are eligible to claim the credit but have failed to do so; requiring the Comptroller, for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2024, to provide, as a part of the Program, certain forms to claim the Maryland earned income tax credit to certain eligible residents; requiring the Comptroller to provide certain notice to eligible residents concerning the Program; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0369
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {113024/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (103-26)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/12/2022
Legislative Date
4/12/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax - Return Preparation Assistance Program for Low-Income Families
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable with Amendments {113024/1 Adopted 33 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Maryland Earned Income Tax Credit Assistance Program for Low-Income Families
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (103-26) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Favorable Adopted 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 3/23/2022 Second Reading Passed 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/12/2022 4/12/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Maryland Earned Income Tax Credit Assistance Program for Low-Income Families
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:12 PM
Click to return on the top page