Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill and R. Lewis
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Exempting returned Peace Corps volunteers who have been certified by the Peace Corps as having served satisfactorily as a volunteer and who are domiciled in the State from paying nonresident tuition at a public institution of higher education in the State; establishing that returned Peace Corps volunteers who attend a community college in the State and pay tuition are to be included as in-State residents for computation of State aid to community colleges; and requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to adopt certain regulations.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0554
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/31/2020
Legislative Date
10/31/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2021
Legislative Date
2/01/2021
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2021
Legislative Date
2/22/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {484665/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2021
Legislative Date
2/25/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2021
Legislative Date
2/16/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/31/2020 10/31/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
House 2/01/2021 2/01/2021 Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2021 2/22/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Favorable with Amendments {484665/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2021 2/23/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Returned Peace Corps Volunteers - In-State Tuition
House 2/25/2021 2/25/2021 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2021 2/16/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 17 Click to view Recorded Media
(   15-106.11 )
Last Updated: 4/2/2021 4:20 PM
Click to return on the top page