Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims - Alterations and Repeal of Sunset
Sponsored by
Delegates Reznik, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Jalisi, Kelly, McComas, Moon, Valentino-Smith, Williams, K. Young, Pena-Melnyk, Bagnall, Bhandari, Belcastro, Carr, Chisholm, Hill, Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, Kipke, Krebs, Landis, R. Lewis, Morgan, Reilly, Rosenberg, Saab, Sample-Hughes, and Szeliga
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date of the Pilot Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims; repealing the limit on the total annual amount physicians, qualified health care providers, and hospitals are entitled to be paid for providing certain treatment or follow-up care; and requiring the Governor's Office of Crime Prevention, Youth, and Victim Services to report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the operation and results of the program during the preceding 2-year period by December 1, 2022, and every 2 years thereafter.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0331
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {123426/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations and Judiciary
Text - First - Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims - Alterations and Repeal of Sunset
House 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {123426/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Program for Preventing HIV Infection for Rape Victims - Alterations and Repeal of Sunset
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:14 PM
Click to return on the top page