Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Actions - Damages - Use of Race, Ethnicity, and Gender Data
Sponsored by
Delegates Moon, J. Lewis, Buckel, Charkoudian, Crutchfield, Davis, Harrison, and R. Jones
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 541
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a calculation of damages for loss of earnings resulting from personal injury or wrongful death from being reduced based on race, ethnicity, or gender; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0313
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Civil Actions - Damages - Use of Race, Ethnicity, and Gender Data
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Damages - Use of Race, Ethnicity, and Gender Data
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-15)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/09/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 541
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Civil Actions - Damages - Use of Race, Ethnicity, and Gender Data
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Civil Actions - Damages - Use of Race, Ethnicity, and Gender Data
House 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Civil Actions - Damages - Use of Race, Ethnicity, and Gender Data
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (115-15) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 4/09/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Favorable Adopted 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Second Reading Passed 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Returned Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 541
Text - Chapter - Civil Actions - Damages - Use of Race, Ethnicity, and Gender Data
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:12 PM
Click to return on the top page