Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of the Environment - Zero-Emission Medium- and Heavy-Duty Vehicles - Regulations (Clean Trucks Act of 2023)
Sponsored by
Delegates Love, Fraser-Hidalgo, Charkoudian, Foley, Guyton, Moon, Queen, Terrasa, Turner, and Vogel
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt regulations on or before December 1, 2023, establishing requirements for the sale of new zero-emission medium- and heavy-duty vehicles in the State; defining a "heavy-duty vehicle" as one with a gross vehicle weight rating equal to or greater than 14,001 pounds; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0224
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0829 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2023
Legislative Date
1/23/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2023
Legislative Date
1/25/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/23/2023 1/23/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Department of the Environment - Zero-Emission Medium- and Heavy-Duty Vehicles - Regulations (Clean Trucks Act of 2023)
House 1/25/2023 1/25/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 1:30 p.m.
(   2-1103.1 )
Last Updated: 2/8/2023 5:39 PM
Click to return on the top page