Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Administration of Injectable Medications for Treatment of Sexually Transmitted Infections
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Belcastro, Forbes, Healey, McComas, Reznik, and Ruth
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing pharmacists to administer injectable medications for treatment of sexually transmitted infections; requiring certain insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations, the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, and the Maryland Children's Health Program to provide certain coverage; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0019
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/25/2022
Legislative Date
1/25/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {773325/1 Adopted
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/02/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/01/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Pharmacists - Administration of Maintenance Injectable Medications - Treatment of Sexually Transmitted Infections
House 1/25/2022 1/25/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Favorable with Amendments {773325/1 Adopted 23 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/08/2022 3/02/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Pharmacists - Administration of Injectable Medications for Treatment of Sexually Transmitted Infections
House 3/10/2022 3/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2022 3/01/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Second Reading Passed 67 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 719
Text - Chapter - Pharmacists - Administration of Injectable Medications for Treatment of Sexually Transmitted Infections
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page