Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior
Sponsored by
Delegates K. Young, Belcastro, Forbes, Kerr, McComas, Reznik, and Ruth
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain assistant State's Attorney with knowledge of the case, to meet with a victim of sexually assaultive behavior or the victim's representative within 20 days after receiving a request from the victim regarding a decision by the Office of the State's Attorney to not file a charging document or dismiss charges against an alleged suspect; requiring the assistant State's Attorney, at the meeting, to explain the justification for a certain decision; and establishing certain requirements for the meeting.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0300
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0270 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-7)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior
House 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-7) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page