Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
Sponsored by
Delegate Valentino-Smith
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a certain provision of law requiring a financial aid administrator to verify certain information under certain circumstances; altering the method by which a financial administrator at a public institution of higher education is required to verify that a certain youth is a homeless youth; providing that a foster care recipient or a homeless youth who receives a tuition exemption is a priority for on-campus housing; requiring a public institution to designate a certain homeless and foster student liaison; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0155
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/30/2020
Legislative Date
10/30/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/09/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174365/1 Adopted
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
20BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2021
Legislative Date
3/02/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
2/23/2021
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
4/09/2021
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2021
Legislative Date
3/19/2021
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/21/2021
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/12/2021
Legislative Date
3/28/2021
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/30/2020 10/30/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/09/2021 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Favorable with Amendments {174365/1 Adopted 20BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/09/2021 3/01/2021 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 20BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Tuition Exemption for Foster Care Recipients and Homeless Youth - Alterations and Reports
House 3/10/2021 3/02/2021 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/11/2021 2/23/2021 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2021 4/09/2021 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2021 3/19/2021 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/12/2021 3/21/2021 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/12/2021 3/28/2021 Returned Passed 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Age
Last Updated: 4/16/2021 11:30 AM
Click to return on the top page