Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Public Health - Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Pena-Melnyk, Alston, Bagnall, Cullison, Guzzone, Hill, S. Johnson, Kaiser, Kerr, R. Lewis, Lopez, Taveras, White, Woods, Bhandari, and Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Public Health to make recommendations to improve the delivery of foundational public health services in the State; requiring the Commission to conduct an assessment of the foundational public health capabilities of the Maryland Department of Health and local health departments; requiring the assessment to explain the impact of foundational public health capabilities on the State's ability to respond to certain major public health challenges in the State; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0281
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2023
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commission on Public Health - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2023
Legislative Date
1/21/2023
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2023
Legislative Date
2/13/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {783621/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2023
Legislative Date
2/14/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Commission on Public Health - Establishment
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/16/2023
Legislative Date
2/16/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2023
Legislative Date
2/17/2023
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Commission on Public Health - Establishment
House 1/21/2023 1/21/2023 Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/13/2023 2/13/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Favorable with Amendments {783621/1 Adopted 25 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2023 2/14/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Commission on Public Health - Establishment
House 2/16/2023 2/16/2023 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/17/2023 2/17/2023 Referred Finance 28 Click to view Recorded Media
(   13-4801 through 13-4807 )
Last Updated: 3/14/2023 11:42 AM
Click to return on the top page