Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Information Exchanges – Definition and Privacy Regulations
Sponsored by
Delegate Kelly
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 718
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the definition of a "health information exchange" as used in provisions of law governing the confidentiality of medical records; and providing that regulations governing the privacy and security of protected health information obtained or released through a health information exchange may not prohibit the sharing and disclosing of information that is required to be exchanged under federal law or for payment purposes or the use of electronic health information for purposes important to public health.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Information Exchanges – Definition and Privacy Regulations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/21/2022
Legislative Date
1/21/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843223/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {163829/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (36-94)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {143822/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (37-94)
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Information Exchanges – Definition and Privacy Regulations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (122-6)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 718
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Information Exchanges – Definition and Privacy Regulations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Information Exchanges – Definition and Privacy Regulations
House 1/21/2022 1/21/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {843223/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Floor Amendment {163829/1 (Delegate Grammer) Rejected (36-94) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Floor Amendment {143822/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (37-94) 16 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health Information Exchanges – Definition and Privacy Regulations
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (122-6) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Finance 32AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 718
Text - Chapter - Health Information Exchanges – Definition and Privacy Regulations
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page