Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
County Public Libraries - Minors, Children, and Teens - Prohibited Practices
Sponsored by
Chair, Ways and Means Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Library)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a county public library from charging a fine for overdue library materials borrowed by a minor or intended for children or teens; prohibiting a county public library from charging a reserve fee for library materials reserved by a minor or intended for children or teens; prohibiting a county public library from prohibiting the borrowing of library materials by a minor or the borrowing of library materials intended for children or teen because of a previous overdue library materials; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0250
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/10/2023
Legislative Date
9/10/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - County Public Libraries - Overdue Library Materials - Minors
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2024
Legislative Date
1/16/2024
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {293725/1 Adopted
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2024
Legislative Date
2/23/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
33BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/29/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (110-29)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2024
Legislative Date
2/20/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/10/2023 9/10/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - County Public Libraries - Overdue Library Materials - Minors
House 1/16/2024 1/16/2024 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/26/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Favorable with Amendments {293725/1 Adopted 33BClick to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2024 2/23/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 33BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - County Public Libraries - Minors, Children, and Teens - Prohibited Practices
House 2/29/2024 2/25/2024 Third Reading Passed (110-29) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/01/2024 2/20/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:50 PM
Click to return on the top page