Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws – Licenses and Permits – Prohibited Acts
Sponsored by
Delegate Moon
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a certain prohibition relating to licenses to drive and moped operator's permits; and prohibiting a person from engaging in any fraudulent or dishonest conduct in the examination or testing process for the issuance or renewal of a driver's license or moped operator's permit.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0465
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Licenses and Permits – Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623523/1 Adopted
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Licenses and Permits – Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
4/05/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws – Licenses and Permits – Prohibited Acts
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws – Licenses and Permits – Prohibited Acts
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Favorable with Amendments {623523/1 Adopted 28 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws – Licenses and Permits – Prohibited Acts
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 4/05/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Returned Passed 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 567
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws – Licenses and Permits – Prohibited Acts
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page