Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Clerks of the Circuit Courts – Bonds, Licenses, Oaths, and Commissions
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain provisions and procedures relating to the clerks of the circuit courts, including the execution of certain bonds and the issuance of certain licenses.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0097
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {803729/1 Adopted
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2022
Legislative Date
3/06/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/04/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
4/08/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/27/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
Proceedings
70 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Clerks of the Circuit Courts – Bonds, Licenses, Oaths, and Commissions
House 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2022 3/11/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/14/2022 3/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments {803729/1 Adopted 27 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2022 3/06/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Clerks of the Circuit Courts – Bonds, Licenses, Oaths, and Commissions
House 3/15/2022 3/07/2022 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2022 3/04/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 4/08/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2022 3/27/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 67AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/30/2022 Third Reading Passed (43-0) 70 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Returned Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 440
Text - Chapter - Clerks of the Circuit Courts – Bonds, Licenses, Oaths, and Commissions
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page