Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Coaches – Mental Health Training
Sponsored by
Delegates Attar, Ebersole, Mireku-North, and Patterson
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to develop guidelines for public schools and the Maryland Higher Education Commission to develop guidelines for public institutions of higher education to train coaches to recognize indicators of mental illness and behavioral distress in students who participate in athletic programs in public schools and public institutions of higher education; requiring public schools and public institutions that offer athletic programs to provide a certain training to coaches; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0165
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0375 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/26/2023
Legislative Date
9/26/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2024
Legislative Date
1/05/2024
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Education – Coaches – Mental Health Training
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533224/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Education – Coaches – Mental Health Training
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (115-26)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/27/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2024
Legislative Date
3/12/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2024
Legislative Date
3/13/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/16/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/26/2023 9/26/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Appropriations and Ways and Means
House 1/05/2024 1/05/2024 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. (Appropriations)
Text - First - Education – Coaches – Mental Health Training
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable with Amendments {533224/1 Adopted 36BClick to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Education – Coaches – Mental Health Training
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (115-26) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2024 3/27/2024 Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/27/2024 3/12/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2024 3/13/2024 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2024 3/16/2024 Returned Passed 55 Click to view Recorded Media
(   15-130.1, 7-452 )
Last Updated: 4/2/2024 3:32 PM
Click to return on the top page