Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Voter Registration Drive – High Schools
Sponsored by
Delegates Kelly, Ebersole, and Luedtke
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each local board of elections to conduct a voter registration drive at least once each school year in each public high school in the county in a manner specified in an agreement between the local board and county board of education; and requiring each public official responsible for the use of a public high school to make available to the local board of elections, without charge, the space that is needed in the building for the proper conduct of a voter registration drive.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0284
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0423 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law – Voter Registration Drive – High Schools
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2022
Legislative Date
1/28/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Election Law – Voter Registration Drive – High Schools
House 1/28/2022 1/28/2022 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Age
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:11 PM
Click to return on the top page