Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Amprey
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to update the Maryland State Curriculum for Personal Financial Literacy Education and corresponding financial literacy standards to include content related to managing loans and taxes; requiring the State Board of Education to establish a financial literacy education week; requiring, beginning in the 2023-2023 school year, each county board to offer a certain financial literacy curriculum; requiring each county board to provide a certificate of completion for students completing the course; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0916 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a local government mandate, which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2021
Legislative Date
10/20/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2022
Legislative Date
1/17/2022
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2021 10/20/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Education - Public Middle and High Schools - Financial Literacy Curriculum and Graduation Requirement
House 1/17/2022 1/17/2022 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Age
(   7-205.5, 7-205.6 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:10 PM
Click to return on the top page