Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure – Police Officers – Stop Procedures (Know Your Rights Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Racial and Equity Impact note – 2021 Maryland Police Reform Proposals
Synopsis
Requiring a police officer to display proper identification and provide certain information to certain individuals at the commencement of a certain stop, with a certain exception; requiring a police officer to inform certain passengers and occupants of a certain vehicle of the right to refuse to provide identification to the police officer at a certain time; prohibiting a police officer from seizing certain items without a warrant or using certain tactics or deliberately misrepresenting facts for a certain purpose; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0589
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2021
Legislative Date
1/19/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Procedure – Police Officers – Stop Procedures (Know Your Rights Act)
House 1/19/2021 1/19/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:25 PM
Click to return on the top page