Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act)
Sponsored by
Delegate Mireku-North
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Division of Correction to allow a certain pregnant woman and a certain woman who recently gave birth to transfer to the prerelease unit for women for 1 year following the birth; establishing the Healthy Start Bonding Program to facilitate strong bonds between incarcerated women and their children; and requiring the Division to allow liberal visitation between certain individuals and certain children under certain circumstances.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0071
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0523 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2023
Legislative Date
11/01/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2023 11/01/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Pregnancy and Postpartum Support (Prevention of Forced Infant Separation Act)
House 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   3-901 through 3-903 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:49 PM
Click to return on the top page