Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Police Accountability - Time Limit for Filing Administrative Charges
Sponsored by
Delegates Cardin, Kaufman, and Conaway
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering a requirement for a law enforcement agency to file administrative charges relating to alleged police officer misconduct that is required to be reviewed by an administrative charging committee within 1 year and 1 day after a complaint is filed; requiring an administrative charging committee or law enforcement agency to file any administrative charges for alleged police officer misconduct that reasonably appears to be the subject of a criminal investigation within a certain period of time; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0582 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/16/2023
Legislative Date
10/16/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
4/05/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Favorable with Amendments {313026/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2024
Legislative Date
3/25/2024
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/26/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2024
Legislative Date
3/23/2024
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2024
Legislative Date
4/08/2024
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/16/2023 10/16/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Police Accountability - Time Limit for Filing Administrative Charges
House 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 4/05/2024 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Favorable with Amendments {313026/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2024 3/25/2024 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Safety - Police Accountability - Time Limit for Filing Administrative Charges
House 4/06/2024 3/26/2024 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2024 3/23/2024 Referred Rules 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2024 4/08/2024 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Last Updated: 4/11/2024 4:38 PM
Click to return on the top page