Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff
Sponsored by
Delegate Cardin
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering certain fees charged by a sheriff for service of process of certain papers.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/28/2021
Legislative Date
10/28/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2022
Legislative Date
1/14/2022
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {553829/1 Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (116-14)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/11/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
71 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
Proceedings
72 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/29/2022
Legislative Date
5/29/2022
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/28/2021 10/28/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/14/2022 1/14/2022 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Favorable with Amendments {553829/1 Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Third Reading Passed (116-14) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/11/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable Adopted 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 3/31/2022 Second Reading Passed 71 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/01/2022 Third Reading Passed (35-12) 72 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Returned Passed 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/29/2022 5/29/2022 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 542
Text - Chapter - Courts – Service of Process – Fees Collected by Sheriff
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:10 PM
Click to return on the top page