Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Allowing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for certain union dues paid during the taxable year; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/07/2021
Legislative Date
7/07/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2022
Legislative Date
1/04/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/16/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483722/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {343324/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (41-89)
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/11/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-35)
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/07/2022
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
4/06/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883626/1
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {883626/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-13)
Proceedings
66AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-37)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/07/2021 7/07/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax – Determination of Taxable Income – Union Dues and Expenses to Influence Collective Bargaining
House 1/04/2022 1/04/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/16/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Favorable with Amendments {483722/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/16/2022 3/08/2022 Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Floor Amendment {343324/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (41-89) 30 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/09/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues
House 3/18/2022 3/11/2022 Third Reading Passed (95-35) 32 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/07/2022 Referred Budget and Taxation 47 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 4/06/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {883626/1 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Favorable with Amendments {883626/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (33-13) 66AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (96-37) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Union Dues
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:46 AM
Click to return on the top page