Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policy
Sponsored by
Delegate Healey
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring each public institution of higher education to adopt a policy related to pregnant and parenting students that is consistent with Title IX of the Federal Higher Education Act; and requiring each public institution of higher education to post the policy on the institution's website.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/21/2021
Legislative Date
10/21/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Institutions of Higher Education - Pregnant Students - Policy
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {533725/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/15/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-1)
Proceedings
36AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2022
Legislative Date
3/22/2022
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2022
Legislative Date
3/23/2022
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/21/2021 10/21/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Institutions of Higher Education - Pregnant Students - Policy
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/21/2022 3/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments {533725/1 Adopted 35 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Public Institutions of Higher Education - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policy
House 3/21/2022 3/15/2022 Third Reading Passed (132-1) 36AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/10/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/22/2022 3/22/2022 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/23/2022 3/23/2022 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
(   15-134 )
Last Updated: 3/31/2022 2:55 PM
Click to return on the top page