Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
Sponsored by
Delegates Barve, Boyce, T. Branch, Ebersole, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Guyton, Healey, Henson, Holmes, Jalisi, Lehman, Love, Prettyman, Proctor, Ruth, Solomon, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, Watson, and K. Young
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from stopping, standing, or parking a vehicle that is not a plug-in electric drive vehicle plugged into charging equipment in a parking space that is designated for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles; establishing certain standards for signage designating reserved parking for certain plug-in electric drive vehicles; requiring that a parking space that is for the use of plug-in electric drive vehicles be counted as part of the overall number of parking spaces for purposes of complying with certain laws; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0480 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/06/2021
Legislative Date
10/06/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273524/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Floor Amendment {293522/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (37-94)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (102-30)
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/18/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
30 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
4/07/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed 47-0
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/01/2022
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2022
Legislative Date
5/16/2022
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/06/2021 10/06/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {273524/1 Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/17 (Delegate M. Fisher) Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Floor Amendment {293522/1 (Delegate M. Fisher) Rejected (37-94) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Third Reading Passed (102-30) 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2022 2/18/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 30 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 4/07/2022 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Favorable Adopted 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Second Reading Passed 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/08/2022 3/28/2022 Third Reading Passed 47-0 68 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/01/2022 Returned Passed 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 5/16/2022 5/16/2022 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Text - Chapter - Vehicle Laws - Plug-In Electric Drive Vehicles - Reserved Parking Spaces
(   21-1003.2 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:09 PM
Click to return on the top page