Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Repeal of Spousal Defense
Sponsored by
Delegate Crutchfield
Status
In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a certain prohibition on prosecuting a person for rape or a certain sexual offense against a victim who was the person's legal spouse at the time of the alleged rape or sexual offense.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0033
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0147 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/11/2021
Legislative Date
8/11/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Repeal of Spousal Defense
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Repeal of Spousal Defense
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-6)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {153422/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2022
Legislative Date
3/24/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, Bartlett and Crutchfield)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, Bartlett and Crutchfield)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hettleman and Sydnor)
Proceedings
69 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hettleman and Sydnor)
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Conference Committee Report {453928/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/04/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (131-3)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Conference Committee Report {453928/1
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/02/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
73 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/11/2021 8/11/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Repeal of Spousal Defense
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Repeal of Spousal Defense
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (125-6) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2022 4/04/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Favorable with Amendments {153422/1 Adopted 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/05/2022 3/24/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2022 3/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, Bartlett and Crutchfield) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Shetty, Bartlett and Crutchfield) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Senate Refuses Recede 69 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2022 3/29/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hettleman and Sydnor) 69 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Senate Refuses Recede 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2022 4/02/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Lee, Hettleman and Sydnor) 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Conference Committee Report {453928/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/04/2022 Third Reading Passed (131-3) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Conference Committee Report {453928/1 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/11/2022 4/02/2022 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 73 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:09 PM
Click to return on the top page