Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Housing and Community Development - Adaptive Reuse
Sponsored by
Delegates Stewart, Amprey, Charkoudian, Feldmark, Foley, Holmes, Lehman, R. Lewis, Moon, Palakovich Carr, Ruth, Shetty, Solomon, and Vogel
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that adaptive reuse, retrofitting and repurposing of existing buildings to develop new affordable multifamily housing is an eligible use of certain financial assistance provided by the Department of Housing and Community Development; and requiring the Department to notify applicants for certain financial assistance that adaptive reuse is an eligible use of funds.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0166
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2023
Legislative Date
1/16/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Adaptive Reuse
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/17/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {483429/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2023
Legislative Date
3/09/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Adaptive Reuse
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2023
Legislative Date
3/12/2023
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/16/2023 1/16/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Housing and Community Development - Adaptive Reuse
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/17/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Favorable with Amendments {483429/1 Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2023 3/09/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Housing and Community Development - Adaptive Reuse
House 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2023 3/12/2023 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/22/2023 10:51 AM
Click to return on the top page