Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Farms and Families Fund, Maryland Food and Agricultural Resiliency Mechanism Grant Program, and Maryland Farm–to–School Meal Grant Pilot Program – Alterations and Establishment
Sponsored by
Delegates Charkoudian, Amprey, Boyce, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Healey, Holmes, Jalisi, Lehman, Lierman, Love, Prettyman, Ruth, Stewart, Terrasa, and Wells
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (130-3)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the purpose and use of the Maryland Farms and Families Fund; establishing the Maryland Food and Agricultural Resiliency Mechanism Grant Program and Fund to provide grants to food banks and charitable emergency food providers to alleviate food insecurity; and establishing the Maryland Farm-to-School Meal Grant Pilot Program and Fund to award grants to eligible school districts that include a local food component in school meals and to incentivize the production, procurement, and provision of local foods in school meals.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0121
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/29/2021
Legislative Date
10/29/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {143925/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2022
Legislative Date
3/13/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/14/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (127-4)
Proceedings
35 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/09/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/31/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {843322/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/21/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2022
Legislative Date
3/28/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Otto and Washington)
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Otto and Washington)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Gallion and Hester)
Proceedings
66 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Senate Refuses Recede
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2022
Legislative Date
3/29/2022
Action
Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Gallion and Hester)
Proceedings
50 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Conference Committee Report {163226/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2022
Legislative Date
4/03/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-3)
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/29/2021 10/29/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation and Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Farms and Families Fund, Maryland Food and Agricultural Resiliency Mechanism Grant Program, and Maryland Farm–to–School Meal Grant Pilot Program – Alterations and Establishment
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Favorable with Amendments {143925/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/19/2022 3/13/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Maryland Farms and Families Fund, Maryland Food and Agricultural Resiliency Mechanism Grant Program, and Maryland Farm–to–School Meal Grant Pilot Program – Alterations and Establishment
House 3/21/2022 3/14/2022 Third Reading Passed (127-4) 35 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/09/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/31/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Favorable with Amendments {843322/1 Adopted 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/21/2022 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 49 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/06/2022 3/28/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Otto and Washington) 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 House Requests Senate Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Gilchrist, Otto and Washington) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Refuses Recede 66 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/07/2022 3/26/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Gallion and Hester) 66 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Senate Refuses Recede 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2022 3/29/2022 Senate Conference Committee Appointed (Senators Pinsky, Gallion and Hester) 50 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Conference Committee Report {163226/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/11/2022 4/03/2022 Third Reading Passed (130-3) 55 Click to view Recorded Media
(   9.11-101 through 9.11-103 )
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:09 PM
Click to return on the top page