Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Stop Work Orders
Sponsored by
Delegates Crosby, Brooks, Charkoudian, Fennell, Harrison, Jackson, Rogers, Turner, and Valderrama
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Commissioner of Labor and Industry to issue a stop work order for each work site where the Commissioner has made an initial determination that a contractor or subcontractor may have violated the prevailing wage requirements; requiring a prompt investigation of compliance with certain wage requirements if a complaint of a violation is received or a violation is made known; authorizing the Commission to impose a penalty of up to $5,000 for each day a stop work order is violated; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0001
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/06/2021
Legislative Date
10/06/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Stop Work Orders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2022
Legislative Date
1/13/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/17/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {433227/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2022
Legislative Date
3/10/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Stop Work Orders
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/12/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-37)
Proceedings
33 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2022
Legislative Date
3/08/2022
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623423/1
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {623423/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/19/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2022
Legislative Date
3/20/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-36)
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2022
Legislative Date
3/26/2022
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - State Finance and Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Stop Work Orders
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2022
Legislative Date
5/27/2022
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/06/2021 10/06/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Stop Work Orders
House 1/13/2022 1/13/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/17/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Favorable with Amendments {433227/1 Adopted 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/17/2022 3/10/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - State Finance and Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Stop Work Orders
House 3/18/2022 3/12/2022 Third Reading Passed (94-37) 33 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/21/2022 3/08/2022 Referred Finance 48 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Favorable with Amendments {623423/1 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/30/2022 3/18/2022 Motion Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Favorable with Amendments {623423/1 Adopted 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/19/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/31/2022 3/20/2022 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 60 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 House Concurs Senate Amendments 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Third Reading Passed (96-36) 47AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/01/2022 3/26/2022 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - State Finance and Procurement - Prevailing Wage - Stop Work Orders
Post Passage 5/27/2022 5/27/2022 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 7/21/2022 11:46 AM
Click to return on the top page