Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Kerr, Bagnall, Bartlett, Conaway, Crosby, Fair, A. Johnson, Phillips, Rogers, Simpson, Solomon, and Vogel
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 2:25 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland 3-1-1 Board to establish requirements, procedures, and standards for the establishment of statewide and county 3-1-1 systems; establishing a statewide 3-1-1 system under the Maryland Department of Emergency Management to provide certain nonemergency information, subject to certain requirements; requiring a county to be responsible for certain costs and expenses associated with a county 3-1-1 system; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0030
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1003 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2023
Legislative Date
1/13/2023
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2023
Legislative Date
1/20/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2023
Legislative Date
2/08/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2023
Legislative Date
2/08/2023
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 2:25 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/13/2023 1/13/2023 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Safety - 3-1-1 Systems - Nonemergency Information
House 1/20/2023 1/20/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 2:30 p.m.
House 2/08/2023 2/08/2023 Hearing canceled
House 2/08/2023 2/08/2023 Hearing 2/08 at 2:25 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/8/2023 4:53 PM
Click to return on the top page