Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2022)
Sponsored by
Delegate Griffith
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, in collaboration with certain agencies, to annually collect certain information on the military and jobs, high schools, private career schools, and certain institutions of higher education in the State and to create and maintain a Student Horizon database on the Department's website that contains the information collected; requiring the Department to publish, and each local school system to distribute, the Student Horizon Scorecard on or before certain dates each year; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0498
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0046 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/20/2021
Legislative Date
10/20/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2022
Legislative Date
1/05/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/28/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/20/2021 10/20/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Education - Student Horizon Database and Scorecard (Students Right to Know Act of 2022)
House 1/05/2022 1/05/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/28/2022 2/28/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   7-129 )
Last Updated: 2/26/2022 9:35 AM
Click to return on the top page