Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Chain of Custody
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Boyce, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Lierman, Love, Ruth, Stewart, and Terrasa
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a producer of synthetic turf and turf infill sold or distributed in the State to establish a system, by January 1, 2023, to track the chain of custody of the synthetic turf and turf infill and report the chain of custody to the Department of the Environment, except under certain circumstances; requiring the Department to maintain a website that displays all chain of custody information, names and contact information of certain persons, and a list of the brands; making a violation of the Act a civil offense; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0321
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0857 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/13/2021
Legislative Date
7/13/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment – Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill – Chain of Custody
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2022
Legislative Date
2/21/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {303922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2022
Legislative Date
2/22/2022
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Adams) Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2022
Legislative Date
2/23/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
16 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Chain of Custody
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2022
Legislative Date
2/25/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (97-34)
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2022
Legislative Date
2/20/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
32AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/13/2021 7/13/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Environment – Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill – Chain of Custody
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/21/2022 2/21/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Favorable with Amendments {303922/1 Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2022 2/22/2022 Motion Special Order until 2/23 (Delegate Adams) Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/23/2022 2/23/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 16 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Environment - Synthetic Turf and Turf Infill - Chain of Custody
House 2/25/2022 2/25/2022 Third Reading Passed (97-34) 18 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/28/2022 2/20/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 32AClick to view Recorded Media
(   9-2401 through 9-2404 )
Last Updated: 3/17/2022 11:58 AM
Click to return on the top page