Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Division of Correction – Data Requirement
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Racial Equity Impact Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Division of Correction within the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services to exchange correctional services data with the Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center; requiring the Division to establish the duration of data retention; requiring correctional services data to be collected by the Center; requiring the Center to conduct certain research; and adding the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services as a member of the Center's Governing Board.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/23/2021
Legislative Date
8/23/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2022
Legislative Date
1/07/2022
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/23/2021 8/23/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary and Ways and Means
Text - First - Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Division of Correction – Data Requirement
House 1/07/2022 1/07/2022 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Text - Racial Equity Impact Note
Last Updated: 1/26/2022 11:48 AM
Click to return on the top page