Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions – Standard Time – Year–Round Daylight Saving Time
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the standard time in the State to be Eastern Daylight Time year-round.
Committee Testimony
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1013 Session: 2021 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Contingency - on federal, state, or local action
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/10/2021
Legislative Date
9/10/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (108-24)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2022
Legislative Date
3/18/2022
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/10/2021 9/10/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - General Provisions – Standard Time – Year–Round Daylight Saving Time
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/18 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - General Provisions – Standard Time – Year–Round Daylight Saving Time
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (108-24) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/18/2022 3/18/2022 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page