Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pensions and Retirement - Forfeiture of Benefits - Law Enforcement Officers
Sponsored by
Delegates Wilkins, W. Fisher, Amprey, Atterbeary, Charkoudian, Cullison, Ebersole, Feldmark, Ivey, R. Lewis, Lopez, Moon, Ruth, Shetty, Smith, Solomon, Valderrama, and Williams
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that law enforcement officers are subject to forfeiture of benefits from the State Retirement and Pension System or a local system when a law enforcement officer is found guilty of, pleads guilty to, or enters a plea of nolo contendere to a felony, perjury, or a misdemeanor relating to truthfulness and veracity committed in the course of the performance of a law enforcement officer's duties; and providing for the processes and procedures to implement a forfeiture of benefits.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0141
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/20/2021
Legislative Date
9/20/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2022
Legislative Date
2/07/2022
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/20/2021 9/20/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Pensions and Retirement - Forfeiture of Benefits - Law Enforcement Officers
House 2/07/2022 2/07/2022 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 7/8/2022 2:08 PM
Click to return on the top page