Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Geriatric and Medical Parole
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Parole Commission to consider the age of incarcerated individuals when determining whether to grant parole; altering how the Commission evaluates a request for medical parole; requiring the Commission to develop procedures for assessing parole requests by certain incarcerated individuals; and requiring the Commission to report yearly to the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board on the outcomes of certain parole considerations.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0128
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0157 Session: 2023 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2023
Legislative Date
11/01/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Geriatric and Medical Parole
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2024
Legislative Date
2/10/2024
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2023 11/01/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Geriatric and Medical Parole
House 2/10/2024 2/10/2024 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2024 12:47 PM
Click to return on the top page