Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Right to Engage in Equine Activities
Sponsored by
Delegate Love
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Stating the findings of the General Assembly relating to equine activities; and declaring the intent of the General Assembly that residents of the State have a right to engage in equine activities subject to regulations and restrictions under laws enacted by the General Assembly.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0345
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/04/2021
Legislative Date
10/04/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Right to Engage in Equine Activities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/04/2021 10/04/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Agriculture - Right to Engage in Equine Activities
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
(   2-702.2 )
Last Updated: 1/21/2022 4:57 PM
Click to return on the top page