Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Temporary Licensure, Certification, Registration, and Permitting
Sponsored by
Delegate Crosby
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring health occupations boards to issue a temporary license, certificate, registration, or permit to a service member, veteran, or military spouse who meets certain requirements; and prohibiting a health occupations board from issuing a certain temporary license, certificate, registration, or permit if the issuance would pose a risk to public health, welfare, or safety.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0230
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/10/2021
Legislative Date
9/10/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2022
Legislative Date
1/19/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2022
Legislative Date
1/20/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/10/2021 9/10/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health Occupations - Service Members, Veterans, and Military Spouses - Temporary Licensure, Certification, Registration, and Permitting
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/20/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/19/2022 1/19/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 4:00 p.m.
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/20/2022 1/20/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 4:30 p.m.
(   1-701,   1-702.1, 1-702.2 )
Last Updated: 1/23/2022 5:16 PM
Click to return on the top page