Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Stopped, Standing, or Parked Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegates Healey, Amprey, Barve, Boyce, Foley, Fraser-Hidalgo, Holmes, Jalisi, Lehman, Love, Prettyman, Ruth, Stein, Stewart, Terrasa, and Wells
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a driver to make a certain lane change or to slow the speed of the driver's vehicle in a certain manner when approaching from the rear a stopped, standing, or parked vehicle displaying hazard warning lights, road flares, or other caution signals.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0147
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Disabled Vehicles
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2022
Legislative Date
2/14/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Favorable with Amendments {453126/1 Adopted
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
13 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/17/2022
Legislative Date
2/17/2022
Action
Third Reading Passed (109-23)
Proceedings
14 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2022
Legislative Date
2/15/2022
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
27 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Disabled Vehicles
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/14/2022 2/14/2022 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Favorable with Amendments {453126/1 Adopted 13 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2022 2/15/2022 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 13 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Motor Vehicles - Operation When Approaching Stopped, Standing, or Parked Vehicles
House 2/17/2022 2/17/2022 Third Reading Passed (109-23) 14 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/18/2022 2/15/2022 Referred Judicial Proceedings 27 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 3/17/2022 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page