Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Notice
Sponsored by
Delegate Solomon
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Modifying the manner in which the chief executive officer of a municipality may fulfill certain notice requirements concerning proposed municipal charter amendments; and requiring the municipality to maintain certain records or receipts and make the records or receipts available to the public.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0157
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0381 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/10/2022
Legislative Date
10/10/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2023
Legislative Date
1/12/2023
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2023
Legislative Date
2/27/2023
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2023
Legislative Date
2/25/2023
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Notice
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2023
Legislative Date
2/27/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2023
Legislative Date
2/28/2023
Action
Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2023
Legislative Date
3/27/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2023
Legislative Date
3/18/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873323/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2023
Legislative Date
3/18/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/10/2022 10/10/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Notice
House 1/12/2023 1/12/2023 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/27/2023 2/27/2023 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/28/2023 2/25/2023 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Municipalities - Charter Amendments - Notice
House 3/02/2023 2/27/2023 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/03/2023 2/28/2023 Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment 37 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Energy, and the Environment Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/27/2023 3/27/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
Senate 3/28/2023 3/18/2023 Favorable with Amendments {873323/1 Adopted 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/28/2023 3/18/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/28/2023 11:10 AM
Click to return on the top page