Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Race and Speed Contests - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Lehman
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a certain penalty and the points assessments for certain motor vehicle violations related to participation in a race or speed contest; establishing that a person charged with violations related to participation in a race or speed contest must appear in court and may not prepay the fine; and authorizing the towing and impounding of a vehicle involved in certain motor vehicle violations related to participation in a race or speed contest.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/01/2021
Legislative Date
11/01/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Race and Speed Contests - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2022
Legislative Date
1/10/2022
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/01/2021 11/01/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Race and Speed Contests - Penalties
House 1/10/2022 1/10/2022 Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Last Updated: 2/2/2022 10:06 AM
Click to return on the top page