Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill and Feldmark
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the compensation rate for inmate labor in Maryland Correctional Enterprises to be not less than the State minimum wage; repealing a requirement that the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services reimburse a certain county or the State for certain costs from an inmate's earnings under certain circumstances; prohibiting the Department from deducting certain costs from an inmate's earnings; requiring the Division of Correction to offer job training to all inmates who wish to participate; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0194
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/27/2020
Legislative Date
10/27/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2021
Legislative Date
1/15/2021
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/27/2020 10/27/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Correctional Services - Inmates - Labor, Job Training, and Educational Courses
House 1/15/2021 1/15/2021 Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 4:23 PM
Click to return on the top page