Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law – Sexual Solicitation of a Minor Through Child Pornography – Prohibition
Sponsored by
Delegate Bartlett
Status
In the House - Returned Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from knowingly and with a certain intent soliciting a minor or law enforcement officer posing as a minor to engage in certain prohibited sexual acts with the minor by a certain means.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0113
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2024
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/26/2023
Legislative Date
10/26/2023
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2024
Legislative Date
1/10/2024
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/04/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2024
Legislative Date
2/26/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
36BClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2024
Legislative Date
2/28/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
38 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2024
Legislative Date
2/25/2024
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2024
Legislative Date
3/29/2024
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2024
Legislative Date
3/15/2024
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2024
Legislative Date
3/18/2024
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2024
Legislative Date
3/22/2024
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/26/2023 10/26/2023 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Criminal Law – Sexual Solicitation of a Minor Through Child Pornography – Prohibition
House 1/10/2024 1/10/2024 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/04/2024 3/04/2024 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/05/2024 2/26/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 36BClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Criminal Law – Sexual Solicitation of a Minor Through Child Pornography – Prohibition
House 3/07/2024 2/28/2024 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 38 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/08/2024 2/25/2024 Referred Judicial Proceedings 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/29/2024 3/29/2024 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2024 3/15/2024 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 60 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/03/2024 3/18/2024 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 63 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/04/2024 3/22/2024 Returned Passed 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 4/9/2024 2:25 PM
Click to return on the top page