Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums - Mandatory Insurance Coverage - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Arentz
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the types of elements and units for which a council of unit owners is required to maintain certain property insurance and altering certain requirements for the property insurance policy; and requiring owners of detached units to carry homeowners insurance on the entirety of the unit.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0403
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0553 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/19/2022
Legislative Date
10/19/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2023
Legislative Date
1/12/2023
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2023
Legislative Date
1/17/2023
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2023
Legislative Date
1/17/2023
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Favorable with Amendments {423128/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2023
Legislative Date
3/05/2023
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Condominiums - Mandatory Insurance Coverage - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2023
Legislative Date
3/06/2023
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2023
Legislative Date
3/07/2023
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/19/2022 10/19/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Condominiums - Declarations and Mandatory Insurance Coverage - Alterations
House 1/12/2023 1/12/2023 Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2023 1/17/2023 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2023 1/17/2023 Hearing 1/26 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2023 3/13/2023 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Favorable with Amendments {423128/1 Adopted 42 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/14/2023 3/05/2023 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Condominiums - Mandatory Insurance Coverage - Alterations
House 3/15/2023 3/06/2023 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2023 3/07/2023 Referred Judicial Proceedings 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2023 8:14 AM
Click to return on the top page