Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation - Financial Status
Sponsored by
Delegate Shetty
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting covered entities from taking certain actions regarding organ transplantation and anatomical gifts solely on the basis of an individual's financial status; and requiring, except under certain circumstances, covered entities to make certain modifications to policies, practices, and procedures to allow an individual with financial issues access to services related to organ transplantation.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2022
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/07/2021
Legislative Date
10/07/2021
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/12/2022
Legislative Date
1/12/2022
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2022
Legislative Date
1/11/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2022
Legislative Date
1/26/2022
Action
Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2022
Legislative Date
3/30/2022
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/07/2021 10/07/2021 Pre-filed
House 1/12/2022 1/12/2022 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Health - Nondiscrimination in Access to Anatomical Gifts and Organ Transplantation - Financial Status
House 1/11/2022 1/11/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 2:30 p.m.
House 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing canceled
House 1/26/2022 1/26/2022 Hearing 1/26 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2022 3/30/2022 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 3/30/2022 1:11 PM
Click to return on the top page