Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Reduction of Speed Limits by Local Authorities
Sponsored by
Delegates Lehman, Foley, Palakovich Carr, and Terrasa
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing local authorities statewide to decrease the maximum speed limit to not less than 15 miles per hour after performing a certain investigation; and establishing certain restrictions on the use of speed monitoring systems along highways for which the speed limit has been decreased.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0484
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0404 Session: 2022 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2023
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/22/2022
Legislative Date
9/22/2022
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2023
Legislative Date
1/11/2023
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Reduction of Speed Limits by Local Authorities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/19/2023
Legislative Date
1/19/2023
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2023
Legislative Date
3/13/2023
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/22/2022 9/22/2022 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2023 1/11/2023 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Reduction of Speed Limits by Local Authorities
House 1/19/2023 1/19/2023 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2023 3/13/2023 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/10/2023 4:58 PM
Click to return on the top page